MO HB2457 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes income tax addition and subtraction modifications for research and experimentation costs
Title
Authorizes income tax addition and subtraction modifications for research and experimentation costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-04-24 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-04-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2024-04-17 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2024-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2024-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2024-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tax Reform(H) |
2024-01-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2024-01-18 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |