MO HB312 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to establish a grant program to extend instructional time in underperforming school districts
Title
Requires the Department of Elementary and Secondary Education to establish a grant program to extend instructional time in underperforming school districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-16 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-16 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Education(H) |
2015-04-09 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-04-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-04-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-07 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2014-12-29 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB312&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0312I.PDF |