MO HB315 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health care services
Title
Changes the laws regarding health care services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-13 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-04-30 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-04-30 | House | House Concurs (H) - SS ADOPTED AYES: 152 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 16, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 16, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1 |
2013-04-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 4 |
2013-04-04 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Perfected (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-19 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred: Health Insurance(H) |
2013-01-28 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-24 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |