MO HB361 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-02 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Missouri Firearms Freedom Act
Title
Establishes the Missouri Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2011-03-28 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-03-17 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |