MO HB366 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-09 - Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S)
Pending: Senate Ways And Means And Fiscal Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding economic development
Title
Changes the laws regarding economic development
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-21 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-20 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Laid Over (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Taken Up for Perfection (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-01 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-01 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred: Economic Development (H) | |
2011-01-31 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-01-27 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |