MO HB467 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a public water system to notify the Department of Natural Resources, the Department of Health and Senior Services, and its customers at least 30 days prior to a vote to cease fluoridation
Title
Requires a public water system to notify the Department of Natural Resources, the Department of Health and Senior Services, and its customers at least 30 days prior to a vote to cease fluoridation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-07 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-05-07 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-05-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Tourism and Natural Resources(H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB467&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0467I.htm |