MO HB478 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding shares in credit unions
Title
Changes the laws regarding shares in credit unions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-06-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - MONDAY, APRIL 8, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections(S) |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 153 NOES: 1 |
2013-04-02 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-06 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |