MO HB512 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Downsizing State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the possession of less than 35 grams of marijuana and the possession of marijuana drug paraphernalia
Title
Changes the laws regarding the possession of less than 35 grams of marijuana and the possession of marijuana drug paraphernalia
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-05-14 | House | Referred: Downsizing State Government(H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB512&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0512I.htm |