MO HB52 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-09 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an insurance policyholder to petition the court for reimbursement of insurance costs as they occur during the pendency of a dissolution of marriage or legal separation
Title
Allows an insurance policyholder to petition the court for reimbursement of insurance costs as they occur during the pendency of a dissolution of marriage or legal separation
Sponsors
Rep. Rocky Miller [R] | Rep. Randy Pike [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-14 | House | Referred: Insurance Policy(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-14 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB52&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0052I.htm |