MO HB523 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-10 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act, insurance coverage for portable electronics, and residential and home warranty service contracts
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association Act, insurance coverage for portable electronics, and residential and home warranty service contracts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-05 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Second Read and Referred: Small Business, Insurance, and Industry (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-20 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-04-20 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-05 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-04-05 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Insurance Policy (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |