MO HB579 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-04 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Health, Mental Health, Seniors And Families Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health care
Title
Changes the laws regarding health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Emergency Clause Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-21 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-04-20 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-19 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-07 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-31 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-30 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-30 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Health Care Policy (H) | |
2011-02-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |