MO HB700 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies when a court may grant grandparent visitation.
Title
Modifies when a court may grant grandparent visitation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - House - House: HB 700 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 136 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, April 29, 2019, 2:00pm, SCR 1 |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Second read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 136 NOES: 8 PRESENT: 3 |
2019-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2019-04-02 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-27 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2019-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |