MO HB869 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Fair Fare Passenger Safety Act of 2011 which prohibits any person operating a motor vehicle for compensation and transporting passengers from using a hand-held wireless communications device
Title
Establishes the Fair Fare Passenger Safety Act of 2011 which prohibits any person operating a motor vehicle for compensation and transporting passengers from using a hand-held wireless communications device
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-05-04 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-18 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-31 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB869&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0869I.htm |