MO HCR28 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Adopted (S) - AYES: 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-13 - Adopted (S) - AYES: 33
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly urges the United States Department of Defense to reconsider the reduction and realignment of Army forces at Fort Leonard Wood
Title
Strongly urges the United States Department of Defense to reconsider the reduction and realignment of Army forces at Fort Leonard Wood
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | Senate | Adopted (S) - AYES: 33 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 30, 2013, 12:00 p.m., Senate Lounge |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported to The Senate (S) |
2013-04-08 | House | Adopted (H) - AYES: 148 |
2013-04-08 | House | Taken Up |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-25 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR28&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HCR0028I.htm |