MO HCR38 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 28 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-28 - House Message (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates the Human Trafficking Task Force

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates the Human Trafficking Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-28 - House - HCR 38 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - House - HCR 38 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - HCR 38 HCRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-28HouseHouse Message (H)
2015-04-28HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 151 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-28HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 130 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-28HouseTaken Up
2015-04-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-28HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-04-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-04-23HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2015-04-23SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2015-04-23SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-23SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2015-04-23SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2015-04-21SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2015-04-21SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - SCS voted do pass
2015-04-21SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2015-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 21, 2015, 9:00am, Senate Lounge
2015-04-15SenateReferred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S)
2015-04-14HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2015-04-14HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 152 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-14HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2015-04-07HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-01HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-04-01HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-03-17HouseReferred: Select Committee on General Laws(H)
2015-03-17HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-03-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-03-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-03-11HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-03-04HouseReferred: Emerging Issues(H)
2015-03-03HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-03-02HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback