MO HCR6 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-05-01 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Strongly urges Congress and the Administration to immediately seek long-term and short-term solutions to the rapidly rising fuel costs in this country
Title
Strongly urges Congress and the Administration to immediately seek long-term and short-term solutions to the rapidly rising fuel costs in this country
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-30 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, MAY 1, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-25 | Referred: Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics (S) | |
2012-04-24 | Reported to The Senate (S) - YEAS: 30 NAYS: 04 | |
2012-04-23 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-04-05 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-27 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-03-22 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR6&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0006I.htm |