MO HCR7 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-17 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Pending: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Claims sovereignty for the State of Missouri under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government
Title
Claims sovereignty for the State of Missouri under the Tenth Amendment to the Constitution of the United States over all powers not otherwise enumerated and granted to the federal government
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-17 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2012-04-12 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 17, 12:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE | |
2012-04-12 | Referred: Rules (S) | |
2012-04-11 | Reported to The Senate (S) | |
2012-04-10 | Adopted (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-29 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2012-03-21 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2012-03-08 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2012-03-06 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2012-02-02 | Referred: General Laws (H) | |
2012-01-05 | Offered (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HCR7&year=2012&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills121/biltxt/intro/HCR0007I.htm |