MO HJR48 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the State Lottery Commission to develop and sell a Veterans Lottery Ticket with proceeds to go to the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the State Lottery Commission to develop and sell a Veterans Lottery Ticket with proceeds to go to the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 27 NOES: 4 |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Tuesday, May 6, 2014, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, April 17, 2014, 8:30am, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Ways and Means(S) |
2014-02-17 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-13 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2014-02-12 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-01-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-01-14 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2014-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-12-11 | House | Prefiled (H) |