MO HJR72 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on May 16 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-05-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting the Governor from reducing any payment of public debt and requiring notification to the General Assembly when he or she makes specified payment changes of appropriations
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment prohibiting the Governor from reducing any payment of public debt and requiring notification to the General Assembly when he or she makes specified payment changes of appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Senate Message (S) |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 4 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 16, 2014, 1:30pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Senate Lounge, 12:00pm |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions, and Ethics(S) |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2014-02-20 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 42 |
2014-02-20 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2014-02-18 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - ha 1, ha 2, ha 3 adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-10 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2014-02-04 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2014-01-30 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |