MO HJR78 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-15 - Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all assessors to be elected.
Title
Requires all assessors to be elected.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-07 - House - House: HJR 78 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: HJR 78 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2020-05-07 - House - House: HJR 78 HJRs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections(S) |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2020-05-07 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 109 NOES: 34 PRESENT: 2 |
2020-05-07 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Perfected (H) |
2020-05-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2020-05-04 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2020-05-01 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-03-18 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2020-03-04 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-02-04 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2020-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2020-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2020-01-15 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2020-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2020-01-08 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-12-12 | House | Prefiled (H) |