MO HJR8 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-16 - Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the State Lottery Commission to develop and sell a Veterans Lottery Ticket with proceeds to go to the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund
Title
Proposes a constitutional amendment requiring the State Lottery Commission to develop and sell a Veterans Lottery Ticket with proceeds to go to the Veterans Commission Capital Improvement Trust Fund
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Solon [R] | Rep. T.J. Berry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - THURSDAY, APRIL 11, 2013, 8:30AM, SENATE LOUNGE |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Veterans' Affairs and Health(S) |
2013-03-04 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-02-28 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 1 |
2013-02-28 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2013-02-26 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 Adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-29 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Veterans(H) |
2013-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |