MO SB1048 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (3499S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-14 - SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (3499S.02C)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the powers of the State Auditor
Title
Modifies the powers of the State Auditor
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Governmental Accountability Committee (3499S.02C) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Governmental Accountability Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |