MO SB138 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-11 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Creates new provisions relating to reports issued by the State Auditor
Title
Creates new provisions relating to reports issued by the State Auditor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House: SB 138 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 146 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-11 | House | Signed by Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2019-05-29 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2019-05-29 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2019-05-16 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2019-05-16 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-15 | House | Bill Placed on Formal Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2019-05-09 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2019-05-07 | House | Voted Do Pass H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2019-05-01 | House | Hearing Conducted H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred H Special Committee on Government Oversight |
2019-04-01 | House | H Second Read |
2019-03-28 | House | H First Read |
2019-03-28 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee |
2019-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 138-Riddle |
2018-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |