MO SB267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 267-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 267-Schatz, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the City of Eureka to adopt a sales tax for improved public safety
Title
Allows the City of Eureka to adopt a sales tax for improved public safety
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 267-Schatz, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Local Government and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-14 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Local Government and Elections Committee (1127S.02C) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Local Government and Elections Committee |
2017-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 267-Schatz |