MO SB275 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a water supply district located in St. Charles County to be regulated by the Public Service Commission and modifies eligibility criteria for energy efficiency incentive programs offered by electric companies to low income customers
Title
Requires a water supply district located in St. Charles County to be regulated by the Public Service Commission and modifies eligibility criteria for energy efficiency incentive programs offered by electric companies to low income customers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | H Calendar S Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2013-05-15 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Utilities Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Utilities Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Hearing Conducted H Utilities Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred H Utilities Committee |
2013-04-15 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-11 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee to Floor |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 275-Walsh |