MO SB280 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 280-Hoskins, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-12 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 280-Hoskins, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Revenue to issue both REAL ID compliant and noncompliant driver's licenses and identification cards
Title
Requires the Department of Revenue to issue both REAL ID compliant and noncompliant driver's licenses and identification cards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 280-Hoskins, with SCS |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee w/SCS |
2017-02-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee (1307S.02C) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-01-11 | Senate | S First Read--SB 280-Hoskins |