MO SB30 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 30-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 30-Brown, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals all of the prevailing wage laws and modifies provisions relating to project labor agreements
Title
Repeals all of the prevailing wage laws and modifies provisions relating to project labor agreements
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Brown [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 30-Brown, with SCS |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor w/SCS |
2013-03-12 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee - (0306S.02C) |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 30-Brown |
2012-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |