MO SB369 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 369 & 370-Cunningham, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 369 & 370-Cunningham, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for resident pupils of an unaccredited school district to enroll in another school in the same or an adjoining county
Title
Establishes procedures for resident pupils of an unaccredited school district to enroll in another school in the same or an adjoining county
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SBs 369 & 370-Cunningham, with SCS | |
2011-04-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-30 | Reported from S General Laws Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-29 | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 369 & 370) S General Laws Committee - (0349S.09C) | |
2011-03-08 | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee | |
2011-02-28 | S First Read--SB 369-Cunningham |