MO SB390 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 390-Schmitt, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 390-Schmitt, et al
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes tax incentives to encourage foreign trade
Title
Authorizes tax incentives to encourage foreign trade
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 390-Schmitt, et al | |
2011-04-05 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-04-05 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2011-03-17 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor | |
2011-03-16 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-01 | S First Read--SB 390-Schmitt, et al |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=4203943 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/11info/pdf-bill/intro/SB390.pdf |