MO SB554 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - H Second Read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24HouseH Second Read
2020-02-20HouseH First Read
2020-02-20SenateS Third Read and Passed
2020-02-20SenateReported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-20SenateVoted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-19SenateReferred S Fiscal Oversight Committee
2020-02-19SenateReported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
2020-02-18SenatePerfected, as amended
2020-02-18SenateSA 1 S offered & adopted (Brown)--(3287S01.01S)
2020-02-03SenateReported from S Professional Registration Committee
2020-02-03SenateVoted Do Pass S Professional Registration Committee
2020-01-27SenateHearing Conducted S Professional Registration Committee
2020-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Professional Registration Committee
2020-01-08SenateS First Read--SB 554-Riddle
2019-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback