MO SB569 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to victims of sexual offenses
Title
Modifies provisions relating to victims of sexual offenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - House - House: SB 569 SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | House | Signed by Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2020-05-27 | House | Constitutional Objection filed in House |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2020-05-27 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2020-05-27 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2020-05-12 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2020-05-12 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2020-05-12 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-12 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2020-05-08 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2020-05-08 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-08 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-06 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2020-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Children and Families |
2020-05-06 | House | Hearing Conducted H Children and Families |
2020-04-29 | House | Referred H Children and Families |
2020-04-28 | House | H Second Read |
2020-04-27 | House | H First Read |
2020-04-27 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-04-08 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-30 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Perfected |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Hegeman)--(4010S04.07S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(4010S04.03S) |
2020-03-10 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(4010S.04F) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Reported from S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee w/SCS |
2020-02-03 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee (4010S.02C) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2020-01-08 | Senate | S First Read--SB 569-Koenig |
2019-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |