MO SB57 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - In Conference--SB 57-Romine, with HCS, as amended (Further conference granted)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - In Conference--SB 57-Romine, with HCS, as amended (Further conference granted)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to public works contracts, city ordinances, and hospital district taxes, and limits damages in civil actions against mining companies
Title
Modifies provisions relating to public works contracts, city ordinances, and hospital district taxes, and limits damages in civil actions against mining companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | In Conference--SB 57-Romine, with HCS, as amended (Further conference granted) |
2013-05-16 | House | S conferees appointed: Romine, Richard, Libla, McKenna, Sifton |
2013-05-15 | House | H conferees appointed: Engler, Keeney, Roorda |
2013-05-15 | House | H grants further conference |
2013-05-15 | House | S requests further conference |
2013-05-15 | House | H submits CCR |
2013-05-13 | House | S conferees appointed: Romine, Richard, Libla, McKenna, Sifton |
2013-05-13 | House | H conferees appointed: Engler, Keeney, Roorda |
2013-05-13 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Shull)--(0119H06.04H) |
2013-05-06 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-23 | House | Re-referred H General Laws Committee |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | H Second Read |
2013-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2013-04-16 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2013-04-10 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Wallingford)--(0119S02.04S) |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 57-Romine |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |