MO SB576 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Title
Modifies provisions relating to charter schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-27 | Signed by Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Delivered to Governor | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2012-05-30 | Signed by Senate President | |
2012-05-30 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2012-05-15 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2012-05-15 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2012-05-10 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-09 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-08 | Hearing Cancelled H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-05-02 | Reported Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Voted Do Pass H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-05-02 | Hearing Conducted H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred H Elementary and Secondary Education Committee | |
2012-04-23 | H Second Read | |
2012-04-19 | H First Read | |
2012-04-19 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2012-04-19 | Reported from S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee to Floor | |
2012-04-17 | Voted Do Pass S Ways & Means and Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Referred S Ways & Means & Fiscal Oversight Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2012-04-11 | Perfected | |
2012-04-11 | SS for SCS S adopted | |
2012-04-11 | SA 4 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4705S008.04S) | |
2012-04-11 | SA 3 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4705S08.03S) | |
2012-04-11 | SA 2 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4705S08.06S) | |
2012-04-11 | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & defeated (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4705S08.01S) | |
2012-04-11 | SS for SCS S offered (Stouffer)--(4705S.08F) | |
2012-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2012-04-04 | Taken up for Perfection | |
2012-03-29 | Reported from S Education Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-07 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Education Committee - (4705S.05C) | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee | |
2012-01-05 | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee | |
2012-01-04 | S First Read--SB 576-Stouffer | |
2011-12-21 | Prefiled |