MO SB58 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-28 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies annexation procedures, allows certain cities to adopt nuisance abatement ordinances, and modifies ordinance adoption procedures in certain cities
Title
Modifies annexation procedures, allows certain cities to adopt nuisance abatement ordinances, and modifies ordinance adoption procedures in certain cities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-13 | House | S Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-13 | House | S concurs in HA 2 |
2013-05-13 | House | S concurs in HA 1 |
2013-05-13 | House | H Third Read and Passed, as amended |
2013-05-13 | House | HA 2 H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(0155S02.02H) |
2013-05-13 | House | HA 1 H offered & adopted (Engler)--(0155S02.02L) |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Local Government Committee |
2013-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Local Government Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | Hearing Conducted H Local Government Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Local Government Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-18 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-14 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee - Consent |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 58-Romine |
2012-12-03 | Senate | Prefiled |