MO SB59 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the regulation of the Missouri Property and Casualty Insurance Association and the Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the regulation of the Missouri Property and Casualty Insurance Association and the Missouri Life and Health Insurance Guaranty Association
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Rupp [R] | Rep. Don Gosen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Signed by Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-02 | House | Signed by House Speaker |
2013-05-01 | House | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2013-05-01 | House | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2013-05-01 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2013-05-01 | House | H Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2013-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee - Consent |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee - Consent |
2013-04-09 | House | Voted Do Pass H Insurance Policy Committee - Consent |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Insurance Policy Committee |
2013-04-04 | House | Re-Referred H Insurance Policy Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Referred H Health Insurance Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | H Second Read |
2013-02-26 | House | H First Read |
2013-02-26 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Perfected |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee to Floor |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Small Business, Insurance and Industry Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 59-Rupp |
2012-12-04 | Senate | Prefiled |