MO SB599 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 599-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 599-Schatz
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the law pertaining to prevailing wage
Title
Modifies the law pertaining to prevailing wage
Sponsors
Sen. Dave Schatz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 599-Schatz |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Reported from S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S General Laws Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 599-Schatz |
2017-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=69471867 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB599.pdf |