MO SB612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-18 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 612-Koenig, with SCS, SS#2 for SCS, SA 2, SSA 1 for SA 2 & SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 2 (pending)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Creates provisions relating to alternative education options for elementary and secondary education students

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates provisions relating to alternative education options for elementary and secondary education students

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateInformal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SB 612-Koenig, with SCS, SS#2 for SCS, SA 2, SSA 1 for SA 2 & SA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 2 (pending)
2018-03-06SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-03-06SenateSA 1 to SSA 1 for SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rizzo)--(4222S20.16S)
2018-03-06SenateSSA 1 for SA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rizzo)--(4222S20.15S)
2018-03-06SenateSA 2 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Rizzo)--(4222S20.10S)
2018-03-06SenateSA 1 to SS#2 for SCS, as amended, S defeated
2018-03-06SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered & adopted (Walsh)--(4222S20.14S)
2018-03-06SenateSA 1 to SS#2 for SCS S offered (Sifton)--(4222S20.13S)
2018-03-06SenateSS#2 for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(4222S.20F)
2018-03-06SenateSS for SCS S withdrawn
2018-02-20SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-02-20SenateSA 2 to SS for SCS S offered (Schupp)--(4222S17.11S)
2018-02-20SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted
2018-02-20SenateSA 1 to SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Chappelle-Nadal)--(4222S17.21S)
2018-02-20SenateSA 1 to SS for SCS S offered (Holsman)--(4222S17.20S)
2018-02-20SenateSS for SCS S offered (Koenig)--(4222S.17F)
2018-02-07SenateBill placed on Informal Calendar
2018-01-25SenateReported from S Government Reform Committee w/SCS
2018-01-24SenateSCS Voted Do Pass S Government Reform Committee (4222S.07C)
2018-01-17SenateHearing Conducted S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-09SenateSecond Read and Referred S Government Reform Committee
2018-01-03SenateS First Read--SB 612-Koenig
2017-12-01SenatePrefiled

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback