MO SB645 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 991 & 645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-17 - Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 991 & 645
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repeals and reduces certain committees and commissions and sets a sunset date for other committees and commissions
Title
Repeals and reduces certain committees and commissions and sets a sunset date for other committees and commissions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Bill Combined w/SCS SBs 991 & 645 | |
2010-03-01 | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee | |
2010-01-06 | S First Read--SB 645-Shields | |
2009-12-01 | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=3157520 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/10info/pdf-bill/intro/SB645.pdf |