MO SB739 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies the provisions governing fire department employee residency requirements
Title
Modifies the provisions governing fire department employee residency requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Lembke [R] | Rep. Bryan Pratt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Delivered to Governor | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by House Speaker | |
2010-05-25 | Signed by Senate President | |
2010-05-25 | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee | |
2010-05-05 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2010-05-05 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-05 | S concurs in HCS | |
2010-05-05 | H Third Read and Passed | |
2010-05-05 | HCS H adopted | |
2010-04-28 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2010-04-21 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2010-04-21 | HCS Reported Do Pass H Public Safety Committee | |
2010-04-20 | HCS Voted Do Pass H Public Safety Committee | |
2010-04-20 | Hearing Conducted H Public Safety Committee | |
2010-04-08 | Referred H Public Safety Committee | |
2010-04-06 | H Second Read | |
2010-04-01 | H First Read | |
2010-04-01 | S Third Read and Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Perfected, as amended | |
2010-03-30 | SA 2 S offered Ruled out of order (Bartle)--(8100S10.01S) | |
2010-03-30 | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Wright-Jones)--(4274S01.02S) | |
2010-03-25 | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor | |
2010-02-22 | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee | |
2010-01-11 | S First Read--SB 739-Lembke |