MO SB750 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the collection of delinquent property taxes
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the collection of delinquent property taxes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2024-03-05 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered (Hoskins)--(3787S02.02S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Emerging Issues Committee w/SCS |
2024-01-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Emerging Issues Committee (3787S.02C) |
2024-01-16 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Emerging Issues Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |