MO SB794 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows certain financial institutions to transfer fiduciary obligations and modifies the law relating to insurance producers and holding companies
Title
Allows certain financial institutions to transfer fiduciary obligations and modifies the law relating to insurance producers and holding companies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled S Rules Committee |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-16 | House | S concurs in HCS |
2014-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2014-05-14 | House | HCS H adopted |
2014-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-30 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-24 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions Committee |
2014-04-22 | House | H Second Read |
2014-04-17 | House | H First Read |
2014-04-17 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Perfected |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee to Floor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2014-01-29 | Senate | S First Read--SB 794-Chappelle-Nadal |