MO SB804 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-13 - H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Contains provisions relating to crimes and criminal court proceedings
Title
Contains provisions relating to crimes and criminal court proceedings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | House | H Calendar Senate Bills for Third Reading w/HCS |
2016-05-04 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Judiciary (Pursuant to H Rule 27.9) |
2016-04-26 | House | Reported Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/HCAs 1, 2, 3 & 4 |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Civil and Criminal Proceedings w/Amendments |
2016-04-20 | House | Hearing Conducted H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Civil and Criminal Proceedings |
2016-03-07 | House | H Second Read |
2016-03-03 | House | H First Read |
2016-03-03 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-25 | Senate | SCS S adopted |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Seniors, Families and Children Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-02 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass S Seniors, Families and Children Committee (4274S.02C) |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Seniors, Families and Children Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 804-Onder |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Prefiled |