MO SB807 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to higher education
Title
Modifies provisions relating to higher education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 807 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 108 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 807 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 807 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-18 - House - House: SB 807 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 109 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - House - House: SB 807 SBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 135 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 21) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | CCS H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-18 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2018-05-18 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-18 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Wasson) |
2018-05-17 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-17 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-16 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-16 | House | H distributes CCR (5054S06.01F) |
2018-05-16 | House | Senate conferees appointed: Wasson, Cunningham, Eigel, Sifton, Holsman |
2018-05-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Lichtenegger, Andrews, Dohrman, Bangert, Razer |
2018-05-15 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2018-05-15 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended, and requests H recede or grant conference |
2018-05-15 | House | Motion to concur in HCS, as amended, S offered & withdrawn (Wasson) |
2018-05-10 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2018-05-10 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & defeated (May)--(5054H04.08H) |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(5054H04.13H) |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Frederick)--(5054H04.10H) |
2018-05-10 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lichtenegger)--(5054H04.04H) |
2018-05-07 | House | Bill placed on Informal Calendar |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-05-03 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules - Administrative Oversight w/HCS |
2018-05-02 | House | Executive Session Conducted H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-30 | House | Referred H Rules - Administrative Oversight |
2018-04-30 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Higher Education |
2018-04-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education |
2018-04-26 | House | Committee Voter Reconsidered |
2018-04-25 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Higher Education |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing Conducted H Higher Education |
2018-03-01 | House | Referred H Higher Education |
2018-02-20 | House | H Second Read |
2018-02-19 | House | H First Read |
2018-02-15 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Perfected |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SA 4 to SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(5054S02.12S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SA 3 to SCS S offered & adopted (Nasheed)--(5054S02.09S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SSA 1 for SA 2 to SCS S offered & adopted (Rowden)--(5054S02.06S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SA 2 to SCS S offered (Schaaf)--(5054S02.05S) |
2018-02-06 | Senate | SA 1 to SCS S offered & adopted (Romine)--(5054S02.03S) |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Reported from S Education Committee w/SCS |
2018-01-23 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SBs 807 & 577) Education Committee (5054S.02C) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Education Committee |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Education Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 807-Wasson |
2017-12-18 | Senate | Prefiled |