MO SB828 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 31 1969 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: No history available
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a process for reducing bias in policing
Title
Creates a process for reducing bias in policing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | Senate | Hearing Scheduled But Not Heard S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence Committee |
2018-01-03 | Senate | S First Read--SB 828-Nasheed |
2017-12-28 | Senate | Prefiled |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/BTS_Web/Error.aspx |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/18info/pdf-bill/intro/SB828.pdf |