MO SB865 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-05 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies various provisions regarding palliative care, the Board of Pharmacy, pharmacists, health insurance, and pharmacy benefit managers
Title
Modifies various provisions regarding palliative care, the Board of Pharmacy, pharmacists, health insurance, and pharmacy benefit managers
Sponsors
Sen. David Sater [R] | Rep. Lynn Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 865 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 865 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 122 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-05-10 - House - House: SB 865 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 140 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (*HA 5) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 24 N: 122 NV: 4 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 108 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 119 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - House - House: SB 865 (A.A., E.C.) SBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 127 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate President Pro Tem |
2016-05-25 | Senate | Reported Duly Enrolled Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions & Ethics Committee |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H Third Read and Passed CCS |
2016-05-10 | Senate | H adopts CCR |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-10 | Senate | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-05-06 | House | CCS S Third Read and Passed--(5458S.07S) |
2016-05-06 | House | CCR S offered & adopted (Sater)--(5458S07.1SR) |
2016-05-05 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-05-05 | House | H distributes CCR |
2016-05-03 | House | S conferees appointed: Sater, Cunningham, Parson, Sifton, Schupp |
2016-05-03 | House | H conferees appointed: Engler, Morris, Wiemann, McNeil, Kendrick |
2016-05-03 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2016-05-03 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended and requests H recede or grant conference |
2016-04-28 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2016-04-28 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2016-04-28 | House | HA9 to HCS H offered & adopted (Burlison)--(5458H05.28H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick-158)--(5458H05.26H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Swan)--(5458H05.05H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Cornejo)--(5458H05.11H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & defeated (Eggleston)--(5458H05.04H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 4 to HCS, as amended, adopted |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HA 4 to HCS offered & adopted (Rowden)--(5458H05.27H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered (Jones)--(5458H05.25H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(5458H05.02H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Engler)--(5458H05.30H) |
2016-04-28 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Engler)--(5458H05.22H) |
2016-04-25 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-25 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2016-04-19 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review Committee |
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-14 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred H Select Committee on Insurance (Pursuant to H Rule 27.8) |
2016-04-06 | House | Reported Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2016-04-06 | House | Voted Do Pass H Health Insurance |
2016-03-30 | House | Referred H Health Insurance |
2016-02-29 | House | H Second Read |
2016-02-25 | House | H First Read |
2016-02-25 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Perfected |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SS for SCS, as amended, S adopted |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SA 1 to SS for SCS S offered & adopted (Schaaf)--(5458S03.01S) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | SS for SCS S offered (Sater)--(5458S.03F) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee w/SCS |
2016-02-01 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (w/SCS SB's 865 & 866) S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee (5458S.02C) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Financial and Governmental Organizations and Elections Committee |
2016-01-06 | Senate | S First Read--SB 865-Sater |