MO SB90 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - In Conference--SB 90-McKenna, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - In Conference--SB 90-McKenna, with HCS, as amended
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to elections and allows council members in third class cities to serve four-year terms upon passage of ballot proposal
Title
Modifies provisions relating to elections and allows council members in third class cities to serve four-year terms upon passage of ballot proposal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | In Conference--SB 90-McKenna, with HCS, as amended |
2013-05-13 | House | S conferees appointed: McKenna, Wasson, Kraus, Silvey, LeVota |
2013-05-13 | House | H conferees appointed: Dugger, Hough, Swearingen |
2013-05-13 | House | H refuses to recede and grants conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S requests H recede or grant conference |
2013-05-09 | House | S refuses to concur in HCS, as amended |
2013-05-08 | House | H Third Read and Passed - EC adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 19 to HCS H offered & defeated (Cox)--(0655H04.06H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 18 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(0655H04.18H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 17 to HCS H offered & adopted (Guernsey)--(0655H04.07H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 16 to HCS H offered & adopted (Korman)--(0655H04.22H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 15 to HCS H adopted |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HA 15 to HCS H offered & defeated (Curtis)--(0655H04.03F) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 15 to HCS H offered (Engler)--(0655H04.03L) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 14 to HCS H offered & adopted (Gatschenberger)--(0655H04.31H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 13 to HCS H offered & adopted (Muntzel)--(0655H04.29H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 12 to HCS H offered & adopted (Diehl)--(0655H04.34H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 11 to HCS H offered & adopted (Fitzpatrick)--(0655H04.04L) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 10 to HCS H offered & adopted (McCaherty)--(0655H04.13H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 9 to HCS H offered & adopted (McGaugh)--(0655H04.09H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 8 to HCS H offered (Fraker)--(0655H04.11H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 7 to HCS H offered & adopted (Jones-50)--(0655H04.12H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 6 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(0655H04.24H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Engler)--(0655H04.01L) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Hough)--(0655H04.26H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Dugger)--(0655H04.15H) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (Lant)--(0655H04.01F) |
2013-05-08 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Entlicher)--(0655H04.23H) |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred to H Rules Committee |
2013-04-17 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2013-04-16 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Elections Committee |
2013-04-09 | House | Hearing Conducted H Elections Committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Referred H Elections Committee |
2013-03-12 | House | H Second Read |
2013-03-11 | House | H First Read |
2013-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed - Consent |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Reported from S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee to Floor - Consent |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee - Consent |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Jobs, Economic Development and Local Government Committee |
2013-01-09 | Senate | S First Read--SB 90-McKenna |
2012-12-27 | Senate | Prefiled |