MO SCR16 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Concurrent Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H Calendar S Concurrent Resolutions
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to modify its river management protocol to make flood control a top priority
Title
Urges the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers to modify its river management protocol to make flood control a top priority
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H Calendar S Concurrent Resolutions | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-16 | Reported to the House | |
2012-04-12 | S adopted | |
2012-04-12 | SS S offered & adopted (Stouffer)--(5281S.02F) | |
2012-02-09 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor | |
2012-02-07 | Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S Offered--SCR 16-Stouffer |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=543298 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/12info/pdf-bill/intro/SCR16.pdf |