MO SCR17 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-18 - H adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the use of the slogan "The Great Rivers State" by the State of Missouri
Title
Urges the use of the slogan "The Great Rivers State" by the State of Missouri
Sponsors
Rep. John Diehl [R] | Sen. John Lamping [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-18 | H adopted | |
2012-05-09 | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Reported Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Voted Do Pass H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-05-01 | Hearing Conducted H Rules Pursuant Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Referred to Rules Committee pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) | |
2012-04-26 | Reported Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Voted Do Pass H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-26 | Hearing Conducted H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-04-17 | Referred H Tourism & Natural Resources Committee | |
2012-03-29 | Reported to the House | |
2012-03-29 | S adopted | |
2012-03-29 | SCS S adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Reported from S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2012-03-20 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee - (4596S.07C) | |
2012-01-31 | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee | |
2012-01-24 | S Offered--SCR 17-Lamping |