MO SJR10 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits the total service in the General Assembly to sixteen years in any proportion between the Senate and the House of Representatives
Title
Limits the total service in the General Assembly to sixteen years in any proportion between the Senate and the House of Representatives
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Motion to vote bill do pass failed S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2013-01-10 | Senate | S First Read--SJR 10-Nasheed and Walsh |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/BTS_Web/Bill.aspx?SessionType=R&BillID=17170429 |
Text | https://www.senate.mo.gov/13info/pdf-bill/intro/SJR10.pdf |