MO SJR11 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 11-Munzlinger, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-13 - S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 11-Munzlinger, with SCS
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Asserts the right of Missourians to hunt and fish
Title
Asserts the right of Missourians to hunt and fish
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-13 | S Informal Calendar S Bills for Perfection--SJR 11-Munzlinger, with SCS | |
2011-04-04 | Bill Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee to Floor w/SCS | |
2011-03-09 | SCS Voted Do Pass S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee - (0761S.03C) | |
2011-03-02 | Hearing Conducted S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Second Read and Referred S Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources Committee | |
2011-01-12 | S First Read--SJR 11-Munzlinger |